Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1932777

EP1932777 - Waste collection container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2011
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siegel, Natalia
Dilbornerstrasse 67
41372 Niederkrüchten / DE
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Frese, Beate
Patentanwältin
Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]Frese-Göddeke, Beate
Patentanwältin Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
Former [2008/25]von Creytz, Dietrich
Tannenweg 25
41844 Wegberg / DE
Application number, filing date07020359.118.10.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateDE20062018819U13.12.2006         Original published format: DE 202006018819 U
DE2007100623808.02.2007         Original published format: DE102007006238
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1932777
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:B65F1/12, // B65F1/14
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
TitleGerman:Müllsammelbehälter[2008/25]
English:Waste collection container[2008/25]
French:Récipient de collecte de déchets[2008/25]
Examination procedure18.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/44]
30.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/43]
10.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2728878  (J. DECAUX) [A] 1-4,9 * page 6, line 18 - page 9, line 29 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1520806  (SINEU GRAFF (SOCIÉTÉ INDUSTRIELLE D'ÉQUIPEMENTS URBAINS)) [A] 1,5-10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE10326930  (S. SCHMIDT) [A] 1,2,5-8,10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE202004017405U  (N. SIEGEL) [DA] 1,9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [PX]DE202006018819U  (N. SIEGEL) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *