Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2052606

EP2052606 - Herbicide combination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hacker, Erwin, Dr.
Margarethenstrasse 16
65239 Hochheim / DE
02 / Waldraff, Christian, Dr.
Franz-Lehar-Weg 7
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
03 / Schreiber, Dominique
Holbeinstrasse 37/04
60596 Frankfurt / DE
04 / Hills, Martin
Am Itzelgrund 5b
65510 Idstein / DE
05 / Feucht, Dieter, Dr.
Am Burggraben 7A
65760 Eschborn / DE
06 / Müller, Klaus-Helmut, Dr.
Solfstrasse 19
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
07 / Gesing, R. F. Ernst, Dr.
Trillser Graben 4
40699 Erkrath-Hochdahl / DE
08 / Bonfig-Picard, Georg, Dr.
Landwehr 29
63517 Rodenbach / DE
 [2009/18]
Application number, filing date07020810.324.10.2007
[2009/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2052606
Date:29.04.2009
Language:DE
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01N47/36, A01N47/38, A01N47/22, A01N47/20, A01N47/16, A01N47/12, A01N47/10, A01N43/90, A01N43/40, A01N39/02, A01N37/30, A01N37/26, A01N37/22, A01N37/18, A01P13/02
[2009/18]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/01]
Former [2009/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herbizid-Kombination[2009/18]
English:Herbicide combination[2009/18]
French:Combinaison d'herbicide[2009/18]
Examination procedure30.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/20]
07.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006114220  (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 25 * * page 35, line 17 - page 37, line 14 * * Tabelle 1: Verbindungen 1.016,1.017 *;
 [DY]US4127405  (LEVITT GEORGE) [DY] 1-8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 32 * * column 8, line 63 * * column 24, lines 33-58 *;
 [Y]WO9710714  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 39 * * page 6, lines 1-36 * * page 8, lines 38-46 *;
 [Y]WO9641537  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, lines 17-28 * * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 17 * * page 20, line 34 - page 21, line 5 * * page 22, line 1 - page 26, line 16 *;
 [Y]WO03015520  (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; example 3 *;
 [Y]WO2004080182  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 31 * * page 10, line 34 - page 12, line 5 *
by applicantUS4127405
 WO9209608
 BE853374
 WO9213845
 EP0084020
 WO9406778
 WO02072560
 US4169719
 US4629494
 DE4038430
 DE2715786
 EP0239414
 US4288244
 DE3303388
 US5457085
 US3120434
 US3480671
 EP0206251
 EP0205271
 US2556664
 US3534098
 EP0053011
 US4385927
 EP0348737
 DE2822155
 US3894078
 GB869169
 EP0447004
 DE1039779
 HU176582
 US3442945
 DE2305495
 DE2648008
 DE2328340
 DE1014380
 HUT53483
 US4802907
 GB1040541
 US2903478
 US3177061
 US2695225
 DE1567151
 GB574995
 DE1031571
 US3175897
 JPH0198331
 US2913327
 WO8300329
 JPS55127302
 DE1300947
 DE2135768
 US3175887
 US3836524
 JPS6067463
 US3582314
 US3330821
 EP0131258
 US4746353
 US4420325
 US4394506
 US4479821
 US5009699
 EP0136061
 EP0324569
 EP0184385
 WO0230921
 WO9215576
 WO9529899
 US4668277
 EP0305939
 WO9641537
 WO9510507
 EP0477677
 CN1080116
 US4789393
 EP0971902
 US5209771
 EP0120814
 EP0087780
 WO8804297
 EP0477808
 EP0030142
 EP0044808
 EP0202830
 WO9741112
 EP0336587
 CN1323789
 EP0189069
 WO2005103044
 WO03061388
 EP0507171
 WO0105788
 US5163995
 EP0142152
 US5828924
 WO0236595
 WO9107874
 EP0333131
 EP0269806
 EP0174562
 EP0346620
 WO9108202
 WO9507897
 EP0086750
 EP0094349
 EP0191736
 EP0492366
 WO0234048
 EP0582198
 WO9745016
 WO9916744
 EP0365484
 WO2004084631
 WO2005015994
 WO2006007981
 WO2005016001
 WO2005112630
 JPS6087254
 WO9838856
 WO9827049
 WO9900020
 WO2007023719
 WO2007023764
 WO9813361
 EP0221044
 EP0131624
 WO9211376
 WO9214827
 WO9119806
 EP0257993
 US5013659
 EP0142924
 EP0193259
 WO9113972
 EP0476555
 EP0048436
 EP0336151
 US4400196
 EP0502014
    - The Pesticide Manual, THE BRITISH CROP PROTECTION COUNCIL
    - CHRISTOU, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 1, pages 423 - 431
    - BRAUN ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 3219 - 3227
    - WOLTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 846 - 850
    - SONNEWALD ET AL., PLANT J., (1991), vol. 1, pages 95 - 106
    - "Factors Affecting Herbicidal Activity and Selectivity", PROC. EWRS SYMP., (1988), pages 227 - 232