Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1882897

EP1882897 - Aligning optical components of an optical measuring system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renishaw plc
New Mills Wotton-under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/05]For all designated states
Renishaw plc
New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / McMurtry, David Roberts
Park Farm Stancombe
Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 6AT / GB
02 / Angood, Stephen Mark
248 Thorney Leys Witney
Oxon OX28 5PB / GB
 [2008/05]
Representative(s)Fry, Emma Leland , et al
Renishaw plc
Patent Department
New Mills
Wotton under Edge, Gloucestershire
GL12 8JR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/05]Leland, Emma Clare , et al
Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton under Edge Gloucestershire
GL12 8JR / GB
Application number, filing date07021686.616.01.2003
[2008/05]
Priority number, dateGB2002000092516.01.2002         Original published format: GB 0200925
[2008/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1882897
Date:30.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1882897
Date:26.03.2008
[2008/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/27
[2008/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/05]
TitleGerman:Ausrichtung optischer Bauteile eines optischen Messsystems[2008/05]
English:Aligning optical components of an optical measuring system[2008/05]
French:Alignement de composants optiques d'un système de mesure optique[2008/05]
Examination procedure15.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/35]
12.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/34]
31.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03702692.9  / EP1468247
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5159989  (CLAXTON GERALD L [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, lines 20-59; figures 1-3 *
by applicantWO0204890