Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1939743

EP1939743 - Message processing using queues [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/27]Event correlation
[2009/22]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAP SE
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
[2014/43]
Former [2008/27]For all designated states
SAP AG
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Franz
Häuseläcker 1/4
69168 Wiesloch / DE
 [2008/27]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/27]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date07022874.726.11.2007
[2008/27]
Priority number, dateUS2006060732030.11.2006         Original published format: US 607320
[2008/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1939743
Date:02.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1939743
Date:27.05.2009
[2009/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/54
[2008/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/27]
TitleGerman:Botschaftenverarbeitung unter Verwendung von Warteschlangen[2009/22]
English:Message processing using queues[2009/22]
French:Traitement de messages utilisant des queues[2009/22]
Former [2008/27]Ereigniskorrelation
Former [2008/27]Event correlation
Former [2008/27]Corrélation entre évènements
Examination procedure07.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
19.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/34]
19.12.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.06.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/34]
Appeal following examination13.02.2013Appeal received No.  T1126/13
26.02.2013Statement of grounds filed
28.06.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
28.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search