Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1939743 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1939743



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 466
19.07.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
05.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
05.07.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
27.06.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
26.06.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 4
26.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
20.03.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
16.03.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
13.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.02.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
13.01.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
18.12.2014 General enquiry Appeal 1
19.09.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
12.09.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 1
22.08.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 4
04.02.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
21.05.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
26.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
26.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
26.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
26.02.2013 Claims Appeal 5
26.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
26.02.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
13.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
13.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
13.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
13.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
13.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
13.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
13.02.2013 Claims Appeal 4
13.02.2013 Claims Appeal 5
13.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
28.12.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
19.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
19.12.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.11.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
28.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
28.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
28.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
28.09.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
10.09.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.09.2012 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
23.08.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.07.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.07.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
27.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
27.04.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
19.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
19.02.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
07.07.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
07.07.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
07.07.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
24.07.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Priority document Search / examination 58
04.06.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.05.2008 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
26.11.2007 Description Search / examination 29
26.11.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Drawings Search / examination 15
26.11.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6