Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2067871

EP2067871 - Aluminium strip for lithographic pressure plate carriers and its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.10.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH
Aluminiumstrasse 1
41515 Grevenbroich / DE
[2013/07]
Former [2009/24]For all designated states
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH
Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14
51149 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kernig, Bernhard
Höninger Weg 145
50969 Köln / DE
02 / Brinkman, Henk-Jan
Sibyllenstrasse 75
53175 Bonn / DE
03 / Hasenclever, Jochen
Karl-Hoch-Strasse 10
53117 Bonn / DE
04 / Steinhoff, Gerd
Hobsweg 39
53125 Bonn / DE
05 / Settele, Christoph
Känntnerstrasse 38
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 [2012/37]
Former [2009/33]01 / Kernig, Bernhard
Höninger Weg 145
50969 Köln / DE
02 / Brinkman, Henk-Jan
Neckarstrasse 40
53175 Bonn / DE
03 / Hasenclever, Jochen
Karl-Hoch-Strasse 10
53117 Bonn / DE
04 / Steinhoff, Gerd
Rosslenbroichstrasse 19
41541 Dormagen / DE
05 / Settele, Christoph
Känntnerstrasse 38
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
Former [2009/24]01 / Kernig, Bernhard
Höninger Weg 145
50969 Köln / DE
02 / Brinkman, Henk-Jan
Neckarstrasse 40
53175 Bonn / DE
03 / Hasenclever, Jochen
Karl-Hoch-Strasse 10
53117 Bonn / DE
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/24]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date07023245.930.11.2007
[2009/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2067871
Date:10.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2067871
Date:20.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:C22F1/04, C22F1/047, C22C21/06, C22C21/00, B41N1/08
[2009/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/24]
TitleGerman:Aluminiumband für lithografische Druckplattenträger und dessen Herstellung[2009/24]
English:Aluminium strip for lithographic pressure plate carriers and its manufacture[2009/24]
French:Bande d'aluminium pour supports de plaques d'impression lithographiques et sa fabrication[2009/24]
Examination procedure09.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/03]
05.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2012Fee for grant paid
11.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013   
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/52]
Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013   
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2712/17
21.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2007
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
LU30.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU30.11.2007
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
LU30.11.2013
Former [2015/32]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/12]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/52]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/38]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/36]LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP1065071  (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE] HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007115167  (ALCOA INC [US]; DEL RIO MARTIN JUAN FRANCISCO [ES]; FUSTER JOSE ALBERO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4686083  (TAKIZAWA KAZUSHIGE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19956692  (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007045676  (HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]; KERNIG BERNHARD [DE]; BRINKMAN HENK-) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0248415  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]; ROTTWINKEL THEODOR [DE]; WRIGHT DAVID SKINGLEY [DE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1676931  (NOVELIS INC [CA]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3563815  (MEIER RENE ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4435230  (FUJIKURA CHOZO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *