Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2067871 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2067871



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 971
10.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
19.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
04.11.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.07.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.07.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.07.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.07.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.02.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Claims Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Claims Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Claims Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Claims Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Claims Appeal 2
10.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
28.02.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.02.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
19.12.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.12.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
15.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.12.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
16.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
16.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
16.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
31.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
31.07.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
31.07.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 4
11.05.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
10.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
07.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
07.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
07.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 19
07.03.2017 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 23
04.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
19.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
04.03.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 4
11.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
01.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
01.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.09.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.09.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 4
05.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
30.07.2014 Claims Opposition 4
30.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
30.07.2014 Claims Opposition 4
30.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.07.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
28.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
28.07.2014 Claims Opposition 4
28.07.2014 Claims Opposition 4
28.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
28.07.2014 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.07.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
27.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.05.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.01.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.01.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.11.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
19.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.01.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.12.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.08.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.08.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.08.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
25.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 9
25.10.2011 Description Search / examination 6
25.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
15.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.06.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
20.05.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.05.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.06.2008 Drawings Search / examination 1
13.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 4
10.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 3
11.01.2008 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Abstract Search / examination 2
30.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2007 Description Search / examination 14
30.11.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 3
30.11.2007 Drawings Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4