Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2067871


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.10.2018 Change: Appeal number
24.02.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.12.2017 Change: Appeal number
18.12.2017 New entry: Appeal number
18.12.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
15.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
18.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
31.07.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
11.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
23.05.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.01.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
22.11.2013 Opposition filed published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
30.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
16.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
02.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
18.01.2013 (Expected) grant published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
11.01.2013 Change - applicant published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
14.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.08.2012 Change - inventor published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
01.08.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.10.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.06.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.05.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.01.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
01.01.2010 First examination report
29.12.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.12.2009 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2010  [2010/03]
02.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2009 Change - inventor published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
08.05.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.06.2009  [2009/24]
27.06.2008 Change - representative published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]