Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1928132

EP1928132 - Method of enhancing continuous packet connectivity in a wireless communications system and related apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.04.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
31.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
2nd Floor, The Axis
26 Cybercity
Ebene 72201 / MU
[2014/26]
Former [2012/18]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
4th Floor, Unicorn Centre
18N Frere Felix De Valois Street
Port Louis / MU
Former [2008/23]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
Offshore incorporations centre Road Town P.O. Box 957
Tortola / VG
Inventor(s)01 / Kuo, Richard Lee-Chee
4F, No.150, Li-Te Road
Peitou Taipei City Taiwan / TW
 [2008/23]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2012/20]Schaeberle, Steffen
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Former [2008/23]Schaeberle, Steffen
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date07023252.530.11.2007
[2008/23]
Priority number, dateUS20060868078P30.11.2006         Original published format: US 868078 P
[2008/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1928132
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1928132
Date:08.09.2010
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1928132
Date:16.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/04, H04L1/18
[2011/35]
Former International [2008/23]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erweiterung der kontinuierlichen Paketkonnektivität in drahtlosen Kommunikationssystemen und dazugehörige Vorrichtung[2008/23]
English:Method of enhancing continuous packet connectivity in a wireless communications system and related apparatus[2008/23]
French:Procédé d'amélioration d'une connectivité par paquet continue dans un système de communications sans fil et appareil associé[2008/23]
Examination procedure30.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/23]
15.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2012Fee for grant paid
06.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.02.2013   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/13]
Opponent(s)01  18.02.2013   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
22.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1907/15
24.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
09.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2007
AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
MT16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
TR16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
IE30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
LU30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
MT16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
TR16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
IE30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
LU30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2014/21]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
MT16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
TR16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
IE30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/51]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
MT16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
IE30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/47]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
IE30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/34]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
BG16.08.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/33]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
CZ16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
RO16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
SK16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
EE16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
DK16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT16.05.2012
BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE16.05.2012
CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
PT17.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
SI16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
LV16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
GR17.08.2012
IS16.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY16.05.2012
LT16.05.2012
PL16.05.2012
IS16.09.2012
Former [2012/47]LT16.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[XD]  - Anonymous, "Introduction of DTX-DRX and HS-SCCH less in RRC", Riga, Latvia, (20061006), pages 1 - 113, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING 56 TDOC R2-063567, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_56/Documents/R2-063567.zip, (20100706), XP002591175 [XD] 1-8 * page 1 *
 [A]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (3GPP TS 25.331 version 7.2.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 331", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20060901), vol. 3-R2, no. V7.2.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014035587 [A] 1-8 * page 157 - page 169 *