Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1949885

EP1949885 - Aerosol hair styling composition comprising natural starch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Germany GmbH
Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2014/02]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klutzny, Jutta
Obere Mühlstrasse 27
64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Cajan, Christine
Bahnhofstrasse 4
56130 Bad Ems / DE
03 / Bräutigam, Ina
Heinrich-Delp-Strasse 14
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2008/31]
Application number, filing date07023615.306.12.2007
[2008/31]
Priority number, dateEP2006002578813.12.2006         Original published format: EP 06025788
[2008/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1949885
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1949885
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/04, A61K8/73, A61Q5/06
[2008/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/31]
TitleGerman:Haarstylingzusammensetzung[2016/49]
English:Aerosol hair styling composition comprising natural starch[2008/31]
French:Composition de coiffure[2016/49]
Former [2008/31]Haarstylingzusammensetzung in Form eines Aerosols, enthaltend Stärke
Former [2008/31]Composition de coiffage sous forme aérosol contenant de l'amidon
Examination procedure26.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/11]
20.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.11.2013Fee for grant paid
19.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.11.2014  19.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2014/52]
13.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0187/17
06.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
19.11.2013Request for further processing filed
19.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.12.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2007
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU06.12.2007
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2016/25]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU06.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US3373126  (DAVID LEHRMAN ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,9 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 60; examples 1-3; claim 3 * * column 3, line 28 - line 43 *;
 [X]US2005002872  (KATZ SAMUEL ELLIOTT [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 10; claim 1 *;
 JP2001226258  [ ] (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., JAPAN);
 [X]US4450151  (SHINOZAWA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 10; examples 4,8,13,15,25,30,32,36,41; claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]EP0948958  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 51; examples 7,8,10; claim - *;
 [Y]EP1598046  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 19 - paragraph 32 * * example 2 *;
 [Y]GB1285547  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 64 - line 105; example IV; claim - * * page 1, line 11 - line 78 *
 [X]  - UCHIYAMA, TAKESHI ET AL, "Powder aerosol compositions containing starch", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20010822), Database accession no. 2001:606788, URL: STN, XP002436103 [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * abstract *