Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1949885 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1949885



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 494
17.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.12.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.09.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
16.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
02.09.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.07.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.11.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.04.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.04.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
06.04.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.04.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
27.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
24.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.12.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
06.12.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Means of redress Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
27.09.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.09.2016 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
22.09.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
22.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
22.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Claims Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
25.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
23.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
01.02.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.09.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
11.09.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
21.11.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
15.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
13.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
13.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.12.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.04.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.04.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.04.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.04.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.01.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
31.01.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
31.01.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
30.01.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.12.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.12.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.01.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
26.01.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.01.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.01.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
04.08.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.07.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.05.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 3
16.04.2008 European search report Search / examination 3
06.12.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
06.12.2007 Description Search / examination 17
06.12.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.2007 Priority document Search / examination 22
06.12.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6