Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1949885


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.09.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
02.09.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.04.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
24.01.2017 Change: Appeal number
20.01.2017 New entry: Appeal number
20.01.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
05.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
05.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.11.2016 Change - German title published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
04.11.2016 Change - French title published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
03.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
31.01.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
16.09.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
13.01.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
21.11.2014 Opposition filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
22.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
24.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2013 Change - applicant published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
04.12.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
22.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.11.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
22.11.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
07.10.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.04.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.03.2013 Change - German title published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.03.2013 Change - French title published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.07.2011 First examination report
15.07.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  08.04.2009  [2009/15]
06.02.2009 Request for examination filed published on  11.03.2009  [2009/11]
31.01.2009 Amendment by applicant
27.06.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]