Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1933290

EP1933290 - Automation of vehicle-related procedures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.10.2012  [2012/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scheidt & Bachmann GmbH
Breite Strasse 132
D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Busch, Erwin
Annakirschstrasse 188
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
02 / Horak, Frank
Kurt-Jacobi-Strasse 48
41189 Mönchengladbach / DE
03 / Rütten, Konrad
Danzigerstrasse 115a
52525 Heinsberg / DE
04 / Schneck, Peter
Am Spielberg 65a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Stenger, Watzke & Ring
Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/25]Stenger, Watzke & Ring
Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date07024189.813.12.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateDE2006105866413.12.2006         Original published format: DE102006058664
DE2007101314615.03.2007         Original published format: DE102007013146
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1933290
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1933290
Date:03.02.2010
[2010/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/01
[2010/05]
Former International [2008/25]G08G1/0962
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
TitleGerman:Automatisierung fahrzeugbezogener Vorgänge[2008/25]
English:Automation of vehicle-related procedures[2008/25]
French:Automatisation de processus liés aux véhicules[2008/25]
Examination procedure02.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
18.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/40]
28.08.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2012
15.11.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9735284  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,3 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 5; figure 1 * [Y] 5;
 [XY]US6112152  (TUTTLE JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 3 - line 12 * * column 3, line 16 - line 25 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 30; figure 3; claim 1 * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP1489578  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US2006255968  (WOO HENRY SUN Y [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1,2,9 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] *;
 [X]US2005099320  (NATH SANJEEV [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] *