blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2073597 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2073597



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 323
03.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.06.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
22.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 4
16.06.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
16.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.05.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
05.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 4
13.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
07.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 5
22.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 2
28.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.01.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.12.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.09.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
19.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
09.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.12.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
20.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
20.12.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
20.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
02.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
02.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
02.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
27.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.03.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.03.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
08.11.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
08.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
08.11.2010 Description Search / examination 5
08.11.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
03.09.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
28.04.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
22.12.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
22.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
22.12.2009 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.06.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.05.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
10.07.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 3
10.07.2008 European search report Search / examination 1
21.12.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
21.12.2007 Description Search / examination 16
21.12.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2007 Drawings Search / examination 6
21.12.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8