Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1880789

EP1880789 - Method of manufacturing a single-piece bladed disc (BLISK) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/04]Method of manufacturing a single-piece bladed disc and mould for implementing the method
[2009/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2011  [2011/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNECMA
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2010/07]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
SNECMA
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fabre, Adrien
74 rue de Gergovie
75014 Paris / FR
02 / Rousselin, Stephane
5 Quai de Seine
77850 Hericy / FR
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Nguyen, Dominique
Snecma
Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB
77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/04]Nguyen, Dominique
Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB
77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR
Application number, filing date07075537.628.06.2007
[2008/04]
Priority number, dateFR2006000654519.07.2006         Original published format: FR 0606545
[2008/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1880789
Date:23.01.2008
Language:FR
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1880789
Date:17.02.2010
Language:FR
[2010/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:B23K20/12, F01D5/30
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2008/40]
Former [2008/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einstückigen Leitschaufelplatte (BLISK)[2009/40]
English:Method of manufacturing a single-piece bladed disc (BLISK)[2009/40]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un disque aubagé monobloc (BLISK)[2009/40]
Former [2008/04]Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einstückigen Leitschaufelplatte und Form zur Durchführung des Verfahrens
Former [2008/04]Method of manufacturing a single-piece bladed disc and mould for implementing the method
Former [2008/04]Procédé de fabrication d'un disque aubage monobloc et moule pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé
Examination procedure18.07.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
24.07.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
01.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2009Fee for grant paid
02.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
22.08.2008Request for further processing filed
22.08.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US4592120  (EGAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 59 *;
 [A]EP1000696  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *