Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1843522

EP1843522 - Method and system for monitoring of a network device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Torii, Minoru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park
Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2007/41]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford & Co., 16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
Application number, filing date07075580.625.04.2003
[2007/41]
Priority number, dateJP2002012932930.04.2002         Original published format: JP 2002129329
JP2002012933030.04.2002         Original published format: JP 2002129330
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1843522
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1843522
Date:24.10.2007
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/26
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2007/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Überwachung eines Netzwerkgerätes[2007/41]
English:Method and system for monitoring of a network device[2007/41]
French:Méthode et système pour la surveillance d'un dispositif de réseau[2007/41]
Examination procedure24.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/23]
28.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03252621.2  / EP1361699
EP06075784.6  / EP1679825
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US4972367  (BURKE THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,9-11 * * column 2, line 10 - line 57 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 4 - line 20 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 37 * * column 9, line 43 - line 49 * * column 14, line 34 - line 68 * * column 15, line 63 - column 16, line 17 *;
 [A]US5638514  (YOSHIDA KOJUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 34 * * column 3, line 1 - line 35 *