Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1864998

EP1864998 - Binding molecules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein 50
3015 GE Rotterdam / NL
For all designated states
Craig, Roger Kingdon
Jubilee House Farm, Spen Moss, Smallwood
Sandbach, Cheshire CW11 2XB / GB
[2013/37]
Former [2007/50]For all designated states
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
P.O.B. 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
For all designated states
Craig, Roger Kingdon
Jubilee House Farm, Spen Moss, Smallwood
Sandbach, Cheshire CW11 2XB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Craig, Roger Kingdon
Jubilee House Farm
Spen Moss
Smallwood
Sandbach Cheshire CW11 2XB / GB
02 / Grosveld, Franklin Gerardus
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
03 / Janssens, Richard Wilhelm
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
04 / Drabek, Dubravka
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
 [2013/39]
Former [2007/50]01 / Craig, Roger Kingdon
Jubilee House Farm Spen Moss Smallwood
Sandbach Cheshire CW11 2XB / GB
02 / Grosveld, Franklin Gerardus
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
03 / Janssens, Richard Wilhelm
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
04 / Drabek, Dubravka
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Bullett, Rachel Margaret , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2013/39]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/50]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07075586.322.07.2005
[2007/50]
Priority number, dateGB2004001639222.07.2004         Original published format: GB 0416392
GB2005001188110.06.2005         Original published format: GB 0511881
[2007/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1864998
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1864998
Date:19.12.2007
[2007/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1864998
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, A01K67/027, C12N5/10
[2007/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/50]
TitleGerman:Bindungsmoleküle[2007/50]
English:Binding molecules[2007/50]
French:Molécules de liaison[2007/50]
Examination procedure19.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/31]
30.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2013Observations by third parties
17.07.2013Fee for grant paid
17.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2013Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05766644.8  / EP1776383
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050766644) is  31.07.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Lewis, Graham Matthew
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
30.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1238/17
13.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2005
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2016/21]CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/28]CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/26]CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/24]CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/22]LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
Former [2014/12]LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT25.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO02085945  (UNIV ERASMUS [NL], et al) [YD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO02085944  (UNIV ERASMUS [NL], et al) [YD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - VAN SPRIEL A B ET AL, "Immunotherapeutic perspective for bispecific antibodies", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 391 - 397, XP004215167 [X] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01659-5
 [Y]  - RIECHMANN L ET AL, "Single domain antibodies: comparison of camel VH and camelised human VH domains", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991210), vol. 231, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 25 - 38, XP004187632 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00138-6
by applicant   - JANSSENS, R. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2006), vol. 103, pages 15130 - 15135
    - KITAMURA ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 350, pages 423 - 426
otherWO2004058820