Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1903507

EP1903507 - RFID system for communicating with vehicle on-board computer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83706-9632 / US
[2008/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Tuttle, John R.
5514 W. Lake River Lane
Boise ID 83703 / US
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Seerden, Adrianus Maria
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade
P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/13]Seerden, Adrianus Maria
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07076054.105.12.1997
[2008/13]
Priority number, dateUS1996075973706.12.1996         Original published format: US 759737
[2008/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1903507
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1903507
Date:02.04.2008
[2008/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G07C5/00, G08G1/017
[2008/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2008/13]
TitleGerman:RFID-System zur Kommunikation mit einem bordeigenen Fahrzeugcomputer[2008/13]
English:RFID system for communicating with vehicle on-board computer[2008/13]
French:Système RFID pour la communication avec un ordinateur de bord d'un véhicule[2008/13]
Examination procedure02.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/46]
24.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/51]
06.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/51]
10.08.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2010
01.10.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04076203.1  / EP1445749
EP06076460.2  / EP1713046
EP97950859.5  / EP0941532
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
06.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200913   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9012365  (AUTO I D INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-7,9,11-17;
 [Y]US5335540  (BOWLER PAUL R [CA], et al) [Y] 2,6,11,16 * abstract * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 2; figure 5 *;
 [AY]EP0725377  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 12 - line 17 * * column 2, line 26 - line 29 * * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 58; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 26 - line 36 * [Y] 3,4,9,12,13,17;
 [AY]WO9501607  (TSAKANIKAS PETER JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 19; figure 4 * [Y] 5,7,9,14,15,17
by applicantUS4875391
 US5459660
 US5278759
 DE3540599
 US5150690
 US4706082
 US4719458
 US4739323
 US4739324
 US4742349
 US4853850
 US4602127
 US6130602
 US4168679
 US4237830
 US4335695
 US4524745
 US4552116
 US5189612