Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1920739

EP1920739 - Stent insertion system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOTEC GmbH
Lotzenäcker 23
72379 Hechingen / DE
[2008/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Barthold, Franz-Peter
Binsenbolstr. 30
72336 Balingen / DE
02 / Lesmeister, Rainer
Klingenhalde 18
72770 Reutlingen / DE
 [2008/20]
Representative(s)Laufer, Gabriele , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]Laufer, Gabriele , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date07079506.707.09.2007
[2008/20]
Priority number, dateDE2006105374809.11.2006         Original published format: DE102006053748
[2008/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1920739
Date:14.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1920739
Date:07.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/49]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1920739
Date:28.03.2012
[2012/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/84
[2008/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/06]
Former [2008/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stenteinführsystem[2008/20]
English:Stent insertion system[2008/20]
French:Système d'introduction d'un stent[2008/20]
Examination procedure31.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/29]
27.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2011Fee for grant paid
21.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2010
Opposition(s)10.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.09.2007
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
LU07.09.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
LU07.09.2012
Former [2014/21]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2013/51]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2013/29]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/49]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/37]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
IE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT07.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1440673  (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0052] - [0059]; figure - *;
 [DA]WO2005023149  (BOLTON MEDICAL INC [US]; ARBEFEUILLE SAMUEL [US]; BERRA HUMBERTO [US];) [DA] 1 * page 43, line 9 - line 33; figures 13,14,29-32 *;
 [DA]EP1369098  (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [DA] 1 * paragraphs [0031] , [0037] - [0041]; figure - *