Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1941902

EP1941902 - Use of Somatostatin analogs in cluster headache [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.12.2008  [2008/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Representative(s)Graff, Alan
Novartis AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Graff, Alan
Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date07100010.302.01.2007
[2008/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1941902
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/31, A61P25/06
[2008/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Somatostatin Analogen zur Behandlung von Cluster Kopfschmerzen[2008/28]
English:Use of Somatostatin analogs in cluster headache[2008/28]
French:Utilisation d' analogues de somatostatin pour le traitment de chéphalée vasculaire de horton[2008/28]
Examination procedure16.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2008/49]
26.07.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/49]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9317037  (SANDOZ AG [AT]; SANDOZ AG [DE]; SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [X] 1,3,5 * claims 1-3 * * claims 1,3 * [Y] 2,4;
 [XY]WO2005041901  (ELIXIR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; GEESAMAN BARD J [US]) [X] 6-8 * page 5, line 14 * * page 23, line 25 * * page 31, line 19 - line 20 * * page 5, line 12 - line 21 * [Y] 2,4;
 [DA]WO9701579  (SANDOZ LTD [CH]; SANDOZ AG [DE]; SANDOZ AG [AT]; ALBERT RAINER [CH]; B) [DA] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO0210192  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; NOVARTIS ERFIND VERWALT GMBH [AT]; ALBERT RAINER [CH) [DA] 2,4 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - M. S. MATHARU ET AL., ANN NEUROL,, (2004), vol. 56, pages 488 - 494, XP002426584 [XD] 1,3 * page 491, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 493, column 2, line 6 - line 19 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.20210