blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1887716

EP1887716 - Communication terminal device and communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/07]Communication terminal device, base station, and communication method
[2011/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.01.2013  [2013/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2008/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Hitoshi c/oFujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome,Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2012/06]
Former [2008/07]01 / Yokoyama, Hitoshi c/oFujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome,Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[2012/06]
Former [2008/41]Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2008/07]Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date07101052.423.01.2007
[2008/07]
Priority number, dateJP2006021963011.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006219630
[2008/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1887716
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1887716
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:H04W52/02, H04B7/26, H04L12/28, H04W56/00
[2011/33]
CPC:
H04W56/0045 (EP,US); H04B7/2656 (EP,US); H04J3/0685 (EP,US);
H04W92/10 (EP,US); Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/07]H04B7/26, H04Q7/32, H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/43]
Former [2008/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationsendgerät und Kommunikationsverfahren[2011/33]
English:Communication terminal device and communication method[2011/33]
French:Dispositif de terminal de communication et procédé de communication[2011/33]
Former [2008/07]Kommunikationsendgerät, Basisstation und Kommunikationsverfahren
Former [2008/07]Communication terminal device, base station, and communication method
Former [2008/07]Dispositif de terminal de communication, station de base, et procédé de communication
Examination procedure06.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
12.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.09.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2011Fee for grant paid
19.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2009
Opposition(s)09.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004196826  (BAO DEREK HONGWEI [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0058] *;
 [A]GB2418806  (IPWIRELESS INC [US]) [A] * page 5, line 21 - line 24 *;
 [X]  - HODGES M R L, "THE GSM RADIO INTERFACE", BRITISH TELECOM TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, LONDON, GB, (199001), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 31 - 43, XP000575496 [X] 1,5,6,9,10,12-14 * p.32, right-hand column, bottom full paragraph * * pp.39-40, "5. System features, 5.1 Adaptive time alignment" *
 [X]  - EKLUND C ET AL, "IEEE STANDARD 802.16: A TECHNICAL OVERVIEW OF THE WIRELESSMAN AIR INTERFACE FOR BROADBAND WIRELESS ACCESS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER,NEW YORK, NY, US, (200206), vol. 40, no. 6, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 98 - 107, XP001123517 [X] 1-14 * p.100, left-hand column, top paragraph * * p.103, right-hand column, first full paragraph * * p.106, left-hand column, middle paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2002.1007415
 [Y]  - PEREZ-COSTA, X. CAMPS-MUR, D., "AU-APSD: Adaptive IEEE 802.11e Unscheduled Automatic Power Save Delivery", 2006. ICC '06. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, (200606), vol. 5, pages 2020 - 2027, XP002446545 [Y] 15 * ISSN: 8164-9547 ISBN: 1-4244-0355-3 Digital Object Identifier: 10.1109/ICC.2006.255067 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2006.255067
 [A]  - JEFF GOLDMAN, "Atheros Moves Forward with Wieless VoIP", (20050616), URL: http://www.voipplanet.com/solutions/print.php/3513206, (20070810), XP002446544 [A] 15 * Paragraph: "Key selling points" *
by applicant   - M.R.L. HODGES, BRITISH TELECOM TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (199001), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 31 - 43
    - C. EKLUND ET AL., "IEEE Standard 802.16: A Technical Overview of the WirelessMan Air Interface for Broadband Wireless Access", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (200206), vol. 40, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/MCOM.2002.1007415, pages 98 - 107, XP002902551

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2002.1007415
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.