Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962049

EP1962049 - System and method for optical coherence tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agfa HealthCare N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2008/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Nebosis, Dr. Rainer
Asamstrasse 10
81541, München / DE
02 / Scheunemann, Dr. Rainer
Baldestraße 11
80469, München / DE
03 / Kopp, Dr. Edgar-Gerald
Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 10
86504, Merching / DE
 [2015/52]
Former [2008/35]01 / Nebosis, Dr. Rainer
Asamstrasse 10
81541, München / DE
02 / Scheunemann, Dr. Rainer
Baldestraße 11
80469, München / DE
03 / Kopp, Dr. Edgar-Gerald
Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 10
86504, Merching / DE
Representative(s)Linsmeier, Josef
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Linsmeier, Josef
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Linsmeier, Josef
Agfa-Gevaert HealthCare GmbH Intellectual Property Tegernseer Landstrasse 161
81539 München / DE
Application number, filing date07102818.721.02.2007
[2008/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1962049
Date:27.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962049
Date:23.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02
[2008/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/52]
Former [2008/35]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur optischen Kohärenztomographie[2008/35]
English:System and method for optical coherence tomography[2008/35]
French:Système et procédé pour la tomographie par cohérence optique[2015/33]
Former [2008/35]Système et procédé destinés à la tomographie de cohérence optique
Examination procedure05.07.2007Examination requested  [2008/36]
30.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2015Fee for grant paid
27.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2008
Opposition(s)26.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.02.2007
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
AT21.02.2016
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU21.02.2007
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
AT21.02.2016
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU21.02.2007
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
AT21.02.2016
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
AT21.02.2016
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2017/13]CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
IE21.02.2016
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/43]CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
LU21.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT23.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US5847827  (FERCHER ADOLF FRIEDRICH [AT]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * abstract * * column 4 - column 10 *;
 [A]US2003076506  (FERCHER ADOLF FRIEDRICH [AT]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]EP0956809  (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]WO9533970  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 20 - page 21 *
 [A]  F. LEXER ET AL, "Dynamic coherent focus OCT with depth-independent transversal resolution", JOURNAL OF MODERN OPTICS, UK, (1999), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 541 - 553, XP008079188 [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 544 - page 548 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/095003499149845