Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965339

EP1965339 - Controller of the energy received by an antenna for preventing corruption of data during a write operation in non-volatile memory of a transponder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EM Microelectronic-Marin SA
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2008/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Lamothe, Christian
Rue de la Gare 2
2105, Travers / CH
 [2008/36]
Representative(s)Vigand, Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A.
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Vigand, Philippe , et al
ICB, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date07103163.727.02.2007
[2008/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1965339
Date:03.09.2008
Language:FR
[2008/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07
[2008/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/19]
Former [2008/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Überprüfer von Energie, die über eine Antenne empfangen wird, um die Datenkorruption beim Schreiben in einen nichtflüchtigen Speicher eines Transponders zu vermeiden[2008/36]
English:Controller of the energy received by an antenna for preventing corruption of data during a write operation in non-volatile memory of a transponder[2008/36]
French:Contrôleur d'énergie reçue par une antenne pour éviter la corruption des données lors d'une opération écriture dans une mémoire non-volatile d'un transpondeur[2008/36]
Examination procedure04.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/36]
14.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0583690  (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6070804  (MIYAMOTO TAIYUU [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP1434167  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *