Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1967099

EP1967099 - Device for preparing a food liquid from a capsule [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PT
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
IP Dept. - Patents
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
IP Dept. - Patents Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Denisart Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
1096 Cully / CH
02 / Meier Alain
Casa Galli
6837 Caneggio / CH
03 / Bonacci Enzo
Ch. Grammont 6
1073 Savigny / CH
04 / Pleisch Hans Peter
Ch. Entre deux villes 2
1802 Corseaux / CH
05 / Talon Christian
Chemin des Vignes 22C
1134 Vufflens-le-Château / CH
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Borne, Patrice Daniel , et al
Nestec S.A.
Centre de Recherche Nestlé
Vers-chez-les-Blanc
Case Postale 44
1000 Lausanne 26 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Borne, Patrice Daniel , et al
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date07103610.706.03.2007
[2008/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1967099
Date:10.09.2008
Language:FR
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1967099
Date:06.01.2010
Language:FR
[2010/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/06, A47J31/40
[2008/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
Extension statesAL10.03.2009
BA10.03.2009
HR10.03.2009
MK10.03.2009
RS10.03.2009
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines flüssigen Lebensmittels aus einer Kapsel[2008/37]
English:Device for preparing a food liquid from a capsule[2008/37]
French:Dispositif pour la préparation d'un liquide alimentaire à partir d'une capsule[2008/37]
Examination procedure10.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/17]
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2009Fee for grant paid
25.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
MT06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
LU06.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
[2015/32]
Former [2012/43]CY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
MT06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
LU06.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2011/26]CY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
MT06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2011/22]CY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
MT06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
IT06.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2011/20]CY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
IT06.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2011/06]CY06.01.2010
EE06.01.2010
IE06.01.2010
LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
RO06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
SK06.01.2010
MC31.03.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/43]LT06.01.2010
LV06.01.2010
SI06.01.2010
IS06.05.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/27]SI06.01.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1486150  (HALE ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,14,19,21 * paragraphs [0021] - [0032] - [50.51]; figures 1-5 *;
 [XA]US3260190  (LEVINSON DAVID J) [X] 1,10,11,14,15,19 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 71; figures 1-4,9 * [A] 5-7;
 [XA]US3470812  (LEVINSON DAVID J) [X] 1,11,15 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3,6-8 * [A] 4,7;
 [X]US2002144604  (WINKLER KARL T [US], et al) [X] 21 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; figures 1,5-7 *;
 [A]FR2842089  (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 20,21 * page 8, lines 6-18,25-31 * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 14 * * page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1669011  (SAECO INTERNAT GROUP S P A [IT]) [A] 21 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0022] , [0023] , [0026] - [0029] - [0033] - [0039]; figures 1-3 *