Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1840302

EP1840302 - Door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BJÖRKBODA LAS OY AB
Dragsfjärd
25860 Björkboda / FI
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
BJÖRKBODA LAS OY AB
Dragsfjärd
25860 Björkboda / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Nabb, Peter
/ Tappovägen 119
FI-25840, Nivelax / FI
 [2011/38]
Former [2007/40]01 / Nabb, Peter
Tappovägen 119
FI-25840, Nivelax / FI
Representative(s)Veräjänkorva, Janne , et al
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
[2012/25]
Former [2011/38]Gustafsson, Aulis Valdemar
AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy P.O. Box 230
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2007/40]Gustafsson, Aulis Valdemar
AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy P.O. Box 230
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date07103777.408.03.2007
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateFI2006000519928.03.2006         Original published format: FI 20065199
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1840302
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1840302
Date:01.04.2009
[2009/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1840302
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:E05B63/20, E05B59/00
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
TitleGerman:Türschloss[2007/40]
English:Door lock[2007/40]
French:Serrure de porte[2007/40]
Examination procedure07.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/45]
16.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2011Fee for grant paid
20.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2011
Opposition(s)22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.03.2007
AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
LU08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
LU08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/22]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/10]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
GB08.03.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/08]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE08.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/07]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2012/47]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2012/35]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
Former [2012/08]LT21.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO03078767  (ASSA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 24 - page 8, line 19; figures 1-6b *;
 [Y]EP1353028  (CERRAJERA IND [ES]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]EP0995865  (FLIETHER KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017]; figures 3,6 *;
 [A]WO9509958  (KARPISEK LADISLAV STEPHAN [AU]) [A] 1,4 * page 7, line 27 - page 10, line 22; figures 1-15 *