Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1818984

EP1818984 - Semiconductor chip with multiple rows of bond pads [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC.
6501 William Cannon Drive
Austin, Texas 78735 / US
[2007/33]
Inventor(s)01 / O' Connor, Shawn M
2914 Aftonshire Way
Austin, TX 78748 / US
02 / Gerber, Mark, Allen
15808 West Dorman Drive
Austin, TX 78717 / US
03 / Miller, Jean, Desiree
105 Swan Court
Bastrop, TX 78602 / US
 [2007/33]
Representative(s)Wray, Antony John
Freescale Semiconductors,Inc
c/o Impetus Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close, Chineham Court, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Wray, Antony John
Freescale Semiconductors,Inc c/o Impetus Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke
Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2007/33]Wray, Antony John
C/o Impetus IP Limited Freescale Semiconductor Inc Grove House, Lutyens Close Chineham Court, Basingstoke
Hampshire, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Application number, filing date07104113.112.09.2002
[2007/33]
Priority number, dateUS2001096658428.09.2001         Original published format: US 966584
[2007/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1818984
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1818984
Date:03.10.2007
[2007/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/50, H01L25/065, H01L23/498
[2007/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2007/33]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterchip mit mehreren Reihen von Anschlussflächen[2007/33]
English:Semiconductor chip with multiple rows of bond pads[2007/33]
French:Puce semi-conductrice avec multiples rangs de plots de connexion[2007/33]
Examination procedure17.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/13]
29.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02800332.5  / EP1451870
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
14.03.200703   M06   Not yet paid
14.03.200704   M06   Not yet paid
14.03.200705   M06   Not yet paid
30.09.200706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1094517  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0075] - [0081]; figures 6,7,16,17 * [Y] 5-10;
 [Y]US6161753  (TSAI YU-FANG [TW], et al) [Y] 5-10 * column 2, line 4 - line 8 * * column 5, line 10 - line 35; figure 9 *;
 [A]US5842628  (NOMOTO RYUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 20 - line 31 * * column 10, line 46 - column 11, line 31; figures 9-15,17,18 *;
 [A]DD272945  (ROBOTRON ELEKTRONIK [DD]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0927512  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-10 * figures 6,8,9 *;
 [A]EP1001462  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1A,1B *
 [A]  - TURINSKY G, CHIPTRAEGER FUER HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-IS, RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, DE, VOL. 41, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 25-26, (1992), ISSN 1436-1574, XP000278769 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *