Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844893

EP1844893 - Method of laser removing of coating material from cooling holes of a turbine component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2010  [2010/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
Alstom Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hoebel, Matthias
Dorfstrasse 82
5210 Windisch / CH
02 / Fehrmann, Bernd
Stadtbachstrasse 77
5400 Baden / CH
03 / Kohles, Christoph
Benninger Strasse 74
71336 Waiblingen / DE
04 / Franitza, Karsten
Fluhmattstrasse 31
5400 Baden / CH
 [2007/42]
Application number, filing date07105515.603.04.2007
[2007/42]
Priority number, dateEP2006011263913.04.2006         Original published format: EP 06112639
[2007/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1844893
Date:17.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844893
Date:03.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/38, F01D5/18, F01D5/28
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IE,   LI [2008/26]
Former [2007/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Laserentfernung von Beschichtmaterialen in Kühllöchern eines Turbinenbauteiles[2007/42]
English:Method of laser removing of coating material from cooling holes of a turbine component[2007/42]
French:Méthode d'enlèvement de matériau de revêtement des trous de refroidissement d'une pièce de turbine[2007/42]
Examination procedure15.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
18.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.05.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2009Fee for grant paid
26.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP1767743  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AP] 1-17 * paragraphs [0035] - [0041] - [0045] , [0046]; figure - *;
 [A]US6380512  (EMER GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 53; figure . *;
 [AD]EP1510283  (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0028] - [0037]; figure - *;
 [A]US6375425  (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 35-65; figures 2-7 *;
 [A]US5153721  (EINO TERUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP1767743
 US6380512