Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1842770

EP1842770 - Articulated platform for a turret [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oto Melara S.p.A. con Unico Socio
Via Valdilocchi, 15
19136 La Spezia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
Oto Melara S.p.A.
Via Valdilocchi, 15
19136 La Spezia / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Sbrighi, Roberto
Via Manzoni 17
25086, REZZATO (Brescia) / IT
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2007/41]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07105646.904.04.2007
[2007/41]
Priority number, dateIT2006MI0066805.04.2006         Original published format: IT MI20060668
[2007/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1842770
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1842770
Date:05.03.2008
[2008/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:B63G1/00, B63G13/00, A62C31/24, F41A23/20, G12B5/00
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
Extension statesAL29.08.2008
BA29.08.2008
HR29.08.2008
MK29.08.2008
RS29.08.2008
TitleGerman:Schwenkbare Plattform für einen Drehturm[2007/41]
English:Articulated platform for a turret[2007/41]
French:Plateforme orientable pour une tourelle[2007/41]
Examination procedure29.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/34]
02.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/34]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202004020633U  (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP1671882  (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2464185  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 3 - line 18 * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0072669  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 2A-4B *