Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1843345

EP1843345 - Removable cartridge identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2010  [2010/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prostor Systems, Inc.
5555 Central Avenue, Suite 100
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Georgis, Steven P.
1989 Oak Avenue
Boulder CO 80304 / US
02 / Bukowski, Christopher
466 Marine Street
Boulder CO 80302 / US
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)McCall, John Douglas
WP Thompson
Coopers Building
Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]McCall, John Douglas
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [2007/41]McCall, John Douglas
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date07105898.610.04.2007
[2007/41]
Priority number, dateUS2006027908307.04.2006         Original published format: US 279083
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1843345
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1843345
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/30, G11B23/03, G11B23/04, G11B15/07, G11B19/02, G11B15/68, G11B17/22
[2007/41]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Erkennungssystem für abnehmbare Kassette[2007/41]
English:Removable cartridge identification system[2007/41]
French:Système d'identification de cartouche amovible[2007/41]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/11]
19.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005188246  (EMBERTY ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048]; figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0059] * [A] 7-20;
 [XA]US2002144044  (MOON WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0075]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0092]; claims 9-14 * [A] 7-20;
 [PX]WO2006052752  (PROSTOR SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *;
 [XA]US5568455  (BALSOM JAMES [US]) [X] 7-15 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 36; figures 2,4 * [A] 1-6;
 [XA]EP1182660  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 16-20 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1,5 * [A] 1-6;
 [A]US7010647  (KARAMCHETTY SOMAYAJULU D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2002060870  (TENG JACKMING [SG], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6154790  (PRUETT GREGORY B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004143703  (EMBERTY ROBERT GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005004462  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *