Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1850122

EP1850122 - Furnace for performing dilatometric investigations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bähr-Thermoanalyse GmbH
Altendorfstrasse 12
32603 Hüllhorst / DE
[2007/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Bähr, Heinz
/ Körnerstr. 22
32545, Bad Oeynhausen / DE
 [2012/01]
Former [2007/44]01 / Bähr, Heinz
Körnerstr. 22
32545, Bad Oeynhausen / DE
Representative(s)Dantz, Jan Henning , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/44]Dantz, Jan Henning , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date07106087.512.04.2007
[2007/44]
Priority number, dateDE2006101943424.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006019434
[2007/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1850122
Date:31.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1850122
Date:28.05.2008
[2008/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1850122
Date:04.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N25/16, G01N25/48
[2008/22]
Former International [2007/44]G01N25/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/44]
TitleGerman:Ofen zur Durchführung von dilatometrischen Untersuchungen[2007/44]
English:Furnace for performing dilatometric investigations[2007/44]
French:Four destiné à l'exécution de rechercher dilatométriques[2007/44]
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/02]
29.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2011Fee for grant paid
22.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2011
Opposition(s)05.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.04.2007
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
LU12.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
LU12.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2013/35]CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/50]CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/49]CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/48]CY04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/47]CY04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
IE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/39]FI04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/37]FI04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/36]LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/35]LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/34]LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/33]LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
Former [2012/25]SI04.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US4313679  (WOLFF ERNEST G, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 38 - line 50 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE2263340  (LINSEIS MESSGERAETE GMBH) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 17 - line 19 * * figure - *;
 [A]DE859533  (CARL SCHRECK DR) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *