Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1847640

EP1847640 - Multifunction sewing machine designed to sew fabrics using different layouts and types of stitches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VI.BE.MAC. S.p.A.
Via Monte Pastello, 7/I
37057 San Giovanni Lupatoto (Verona) / IT
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Guerreschi, Carlo
Via Campanile Vecchio 14
37061 Cadidavid (VR) / IT
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Fisauli, Beatrice A. M.
Con Lor S.p.A Via Renato Fucini, 5
20133 Milano / IT
[2013/22]
Former [2007/43]Fisauli, Beatrice A. M.
Con Lor SPA Via Renato Fucini, 5
20133 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07106094.113.04.2007
[2007/43]
Priority number, dateIT2006VR0007318.04.2006         Original published format: IT VR20060073
[2007/43]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1847640
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1847640
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:D05B57/30, D05B73/06
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
Extension statesRS18.04.2008
TitleGerman:Multifunktionelle Nähmaschine zum Nähen von Stoffen mittels verschiedener Entwürfe und verschiedener Arten von Stichen[2007/43]
English:Multifunction sewing machine designed to sew fabrics using different layouts and types of stitches[2007/43]
French:Machine à coudre multifonction conçue pour coudre des tissus en utilisant différents agencements et types de points[2007/43]
Examination procedure18.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/23]
20.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2013Fee for grant paid
02.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2008
Opposition(s)03.03.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.04.2007
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
[2016/32]
Former [2016/31]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2016/16]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/52]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0288095  (IWASE TAKAYOSHI) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,14 * abstract *;
 [A]US4967677  (SEIRIKI MATSUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2188951  (VIBEMAC SRL) [A] 1,14 * figure - *;
 [PA]EP1719830  (VI BE MAC SPA [IT]) [PA] 1,14
by applicantJPH0288095