blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1854520

EP1854520 - Game program and game apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2012  [2012/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho
Minami-ku
Kyoto 601-8501 / JP
[2012/15]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Asuke, Shigeyuki
Nintendo Co., Ltd 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP
02 / Takemoto, Masataka
Nintendo Co., Ltd 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP
03 / Kouda, Kiyoshi
Systems Research & Development Co., Ltd 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto / JP
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Perkins, Sarah, et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Perkins, Sarah, et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London
EC4A 3BG / GB
Former [2007/46]Perkins, Sarah, et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Application number, filing date07106962.925.04.2007
[2007/46]
Priority number, dateJP2006013047409.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006130474
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1854520
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1854520
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:A63F13/10
[2007/46]
CPC:
A63F13/577 (EP,US); A63F13/52 (EP,US); A63F13/2145 (EP);
A63F13/26 (EP,US); A63F13/426 (EP); A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F2300/1075 (EP); A63F2300/204 (EP); A63F2300/301 (EP);
A63F2300/64 (US); A63F2300/643 (EP,US); A63F2300/66 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/30]
Former [2007/46]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spielprogramm und Spielgerät[2007/46]
English:Game program and game apparatus[2007/46]
French:Logiciel et appareil de jeu[2007/46]
Examination procedure16.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
15.05.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.06.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
14.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2011Fee for grant paid
06.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination19.03.2010Appeal received No.  T1225/10
21.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
11.01.2011Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
11.01.2011Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2008
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06337918  (HUDSON SOFT CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] *;
 [Y]US6102801  (SUGAWARA MASARU [JP]) [Y] 4,5,15,16 * abstract * * columns 11,12 *;
 [XY]US6128018  (NAKAJIMA NOBUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * abstract * * columns 1,2 * * column 13, line 8 - column 14, line 12 * [Y] 4,5,15,16;
 [A]EP1062993  (NAMCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]  - JOHN AMATO, "Collision Detection", (19990915), URL: www.gamedev.net/reference/articles/article735.asp, (20070719), XP002443633 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6102801
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.