Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1867494

EP1867494 - Vehicle pneumatic tyre with side wall reinforcement profile [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2007/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Recker, Dr. Carla
Blumenhagenstrasse 13
30167, Hannover / DE
02 / Katrakova, Dr. Danka
Grosse Pranke 13
30419, Hannover / DE
 [2007/51]
Application number, filing date07107070.027.04.2007
[2007/51]
Priority number, dateDE2006102786716.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006027867
[2007/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1867494
Date:19.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1867494
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60C1/00, B60C17/04, B60C17/06, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L21/00
[2007/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/51]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugluftreifen mit Seitenwand-Verstärkungsprofil[2007/51]
English:Vehicle pneumatic tyre with side wall reinforcement profile[2007/51]
French:Pneus de véhicule à profilé de renfort latéral[2007/51]
Examination procedure19.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
29.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
LU27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
LU27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
LU27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/20]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/06]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/43]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT27.04.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/27]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BE30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/17]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/05]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004031550  (KANENARI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1514899  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1279687  (SARTOMER TECHNOLOGY CO INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4824908  (TSUTSUMI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4424306  (KITAHARA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0386905  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * example 4; claims 1,15 *