Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1872958

EP1872958 - Thermal printer and printing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2011  [2011/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
For all designated states
NCR Corporation
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
For all designated states
NCR Corporation
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Former [2008/01]For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sekino, Toshiharu Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
c/o Int. Property Division 2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
02 / Sanada, Tsuyoshi Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
c/o Int. Property Division 2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
03 / Nihashi, Kiyotaka Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
c/o Int. Property Division 2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
04 / Hiyoshi, Takeshi Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
c/o Int. Property Division 2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
05 / Takahashi, Kousuke Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
c/o Int. Property Division 2-17-2, Higashigotanda
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8
65201 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date07108845.424.05.2007
[2008/01]
Priority number, dateJP2006017894429.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006178944
JP2006017894829.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006178948
JP2006017895729.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006178957
JP2006018850207.07.2006         Original published format: JP 2006188502
JP2007001411224.01.2007         Original published format: JP 2007014112
[2008/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1872958
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1872958
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1872958
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B41J29/02
[2008/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/43]
Former [2008/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Thermodrucker und Druckvorrichtung[2008/01]
English:Thermal printer and printing device[2008/01]
French:Imprimante thermique et dispositif d'impression[2008/01]
Examination procedure24.05.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
24.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2010Fee for grant paid
16.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09160382.9  / EP2080626
EP09160384.5  / EP2080627
EP09160385.2  / EP2080628
Opposition(s)04.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6155731  (BERTALAN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,1A,3,6,7A,9A,10-13 * * column 3, line 20 - line 67 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 2 * * column 7, line 12 - line 15 * * column 7, line 23 - line 47 * [A] 5-8;
 [X]US2003118390  (YAMADA RIKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-8,10,11,14 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] *;
 [X]EP1108556  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [X]US2004119808  (MORI YUKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 9 * figures 3,4,6 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] *;
 [A]US6113292  (UNNO TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 9-12 * column 6 - column 9; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]JPS61242863  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 9-12 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1862322  (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [E] 13 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0079]; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]WO2005047006  (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 13-17 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH11286147
 US3118469
 US6784906
 US6155731
 US2003118390