EP1862835 - Telephoto-type zoom lens comprising four lens groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshi, Koji CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd., European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07109284.5 | 31.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | JP20060151545 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006151545 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862835 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1862835 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/173, G02B27/64 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
G02B15/144113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | Telezoomobjektiv mit vier Linsengruppen | [2007/49] | English: | Telephoto-type zoom lens comprising four lens groups | [2007/49] | French: | Téléobjectif à focale variable ayant quatre groupes de lentilles | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH07128619 (CANON KK) [YD] 2,3 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2000028922 (CANON KK) [Y] 4,7* figure 2; example 2; table 2 *; | [XY]JP2001305426 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0082] , [0086]; figure 1; tables 1,3 * [Y] 2-4,7 | by applicant | JP2000028922 | JP2001305426 |