blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1870510 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1870510



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 513
06.11.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
17.04.2018 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 9
21.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.03.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
13.03.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.03.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.12.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
14.12.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 6
03.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
19.10.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
02.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
18.09.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.06.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 2
24.05.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
31.03.2015 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 3
10.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
10.03.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 22
02.12.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
08.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
01.08.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
01.08.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
29.07.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
23.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
23.07.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
03.06.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
31.05.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
28.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
26.04.2013 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
15.03.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
15.03.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
06.10.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
07.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2012 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
30.07.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
10.04.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.04.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.03.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
22.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
21.02.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
21.02.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.02.2012 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
17.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
17.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.04.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.04.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.04.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 2
22.02.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
26.01.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.01.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
28.12.2010 General authorisation Search / examination 2
28.12.2010 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.11.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2010 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
18.09.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
19.07.2010 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 2
29.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
18.03.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
18.03.2010 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 2
03.03.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.02.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 1
18.02.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
28.11.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.08.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
01.08.2007 Priority document Search / examination 20
01.08.2007 Priority document Search / examination 18
21.06.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Description Search / examination 13
21.06.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Drawings Search / examination 2
21.06.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3