Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1832627

EP1832627 - CURABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/37]Curable composition
[2007/43]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-3-18, Nakanoshima
Kita-ku
Osaka / JP
[2018/24]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku
Osaka / JP
Former [2007/37]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Toshihiko
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
02 / Wakabayashi, Katsuyu
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
03 / Ito, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
04 / Ando, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
 [2018/24]
Former [2010/36]01 / Okamoto, Toshihiko
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
02 / Wakabayashi, Katsuyu
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
03 / Ito, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
04 / Ando, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
Former [2010/15]01 / OKAMOTO, Toshihiko
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
02 / WAKABAYASHI, Katsuyu
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
03 / ITO, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
04 / ANDO, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
Former [2008/42]01 / OKAMOTO, Toshihiko
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
02 / WAKABAYASHI, Katsuyu
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
03 / ITO, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
04 / ANDO, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
Former [2007/37]01 / OKAMOTO, Toshihiko
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
02 / WAKABAYASHI, Katsuyu
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
03 / ITO, Yuji
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
04 / ANDO, Hiroshi
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Miyamae-cho, Takasago
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP
Representative(s)Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2018/24]
Former [2007/37]Hart Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date07111208.022.10.2003
[2007/37]
Priority number, dateJP2002031933501.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002319335
JP2002036449016.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002364490
[2007/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1832627
Date:12.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1832627
Date:24.10.2007
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1832627
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1832627
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:C08L101/10, C09J201/10, C09K3/10
[2007/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2018/24]
Former [2007/37]BE,  DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:Härtbare Zusammensetzung[2007/37]
English:CURABLE COMPOSITION[2014/19]
French:Composition durcissable[2007/37]
Former [2007/37]Curable composition
Examination procedure27.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
20.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2010Fee for grant paid
15.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03758787.0  / EP1566412
Divisional application(s)EP10169285.3  / EP2233531
EP10169296.0  / EP2233532
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011   
Wacker Chemie AG
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Intellectual Property
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
 02  07.06.2011   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/28]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2011   
Wacker Chemie AG
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al
Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
 02  07.06.2011   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
14.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.05.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.05.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.03.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.04.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.05.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition04.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1474/14
24.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
07.03.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
07.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
FR08.11.2010
GB08.12.2010
[2015/22]
Former [2011/33]BE08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
FR08.11.2010
Former [2011/20]NL08.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6204350  (LIU JUNKANG JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20;
 [XA]US6271309  (ROBERTS GARY P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20;
 [XA]US6287701  (OOCHI IKUROU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20;
 [XA]US5399607  (NANBU TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20;
 [XA]US5639825  (NANBU TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20;
 [XA]US3857825  (STRECK R, et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-20
by applicantJPS5978223
 JPS59168014
 JPS60228516
 JPS60228517
OppositionEP0918062
 JPH08127724
 JP2001072855