Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1989969

EP1989969 - A bed base with/ without a mattress [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Idas Istanbul Doseme Sanayii Anonim Sirketi
Maltepe Mahallesi Mevlevihane Sokak No: 4 Zeytinburnu
34010 Istanbul / TR
[2008/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Iseri, Murat H.
IDAS ISTANBUL DOSEME SANAYII ANONIM SIRKETI Maltepe Mahallesi, Mevlevihane Sokak No:4, Zeytinburnu
34010, Istanbul / TR
 [2008/46]
Representative(s)Berkkam, Ayfer
Ankara Patent Bureau Limited
Kavaklidere Mahallesi
Bestekar Caddesi No: 10
06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Berkkam, Ayfer
Ankara Patent Bureau Limited, Bestekar Sokak No. 10, Kavaklidere
06680 Ankara / TR
Application number, filing date07113419.130.07.2007
[2008/46]
Priority number, dateTR2007000314009.05.2007         Original published format: TR 200703140
[2008/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1989969
Date:12.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04
[2008/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/46]
TitleGerman:Bettgestell mit oder ohne Matratze[2008/46]
English:A bed base with/ without a mattress[2008/46]
French:Sommier de lit avec/sans matelas[2008/46]
Examination procedure30.07.2007Examination requested  [2008/46]
13.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/50]
20.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6357065  (ADAMS CRAIG D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 30 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE20211072U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0399618  (OOSTWOUD HOLDING B V [NL]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]DE3919207  (VOELKER MOEBELPRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, 5810 WITTEN, DE) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]JP2001120389  (IMASEN ELECTRIC IND) [A] 3 * abstract *