Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025249

EP2025249 - A method for cooling beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konings NV
Beringersteenweg 98
3520 Zonhoven / BE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Nulens, Luc
Moverkensstraat 38a
3520, Zonhoven / BE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2009/08]Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date07113522.231.07.2007
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025249
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025249
Date:14.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/02, A23L2/44, A23L3/3418
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kühlen von Getränken[2009/08]
English:A method for cooling beverages[2009/08]
French:Procédé de refroidissement de boissons[2009/08]
Examination procedure10.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
15.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2009Fee for grant paid
26.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
NL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
TR14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
HU15.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
NL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
HU15.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
HU15.04.2010
Former [2012/37]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2012/05]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2011/20]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/43]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/29]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/27]FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2241941  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US2005084581  (SATO YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figure -; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0786513  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002122860  (WILDASIN RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004021807  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005061691  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]FR510697  (ELOI DOTTA [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB189721387  (GRAEFF FRIEDRICH WILHELM HERRM [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [T]DE102006016557  (AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [T] 1-7 * abstract * * figure -; claim - *
by applicantWO2005061691
 EP0631096
 US2005084581
 EP0786513
 US2002122860
 WO2004021807
 GB2241941
 FR510697