Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027917

EP2027917 - Catalyst composition, its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Representative(s)Zeestraten, Albertus W. J.
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
[2009/09]
Application number, filing date07113575.031.07.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027917
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/62, B01J29/44, C07C4/18, C07C15/04
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Katalysatorzusammensetzung sowie ihre Herstellung und Verwendung[2009/09]
English:Catalyst composition, its preparation and use[2009/09]
French:Composition de catalyseur, sa préparation et utilisation[2009/09]
Examination procedure06.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
07.07.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/33]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5689027  (ABICHANDANI JEEVAN S [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 1; examples 6,8-10 * * column 8, line 36 - line 44 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 5 * * column 10, line 14 - line 18 * * column 9, line 53 - line 58 *;
 [X]WO2007037866  (UOP LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * example 3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH0656710  (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0030]; example 1; claim 1 *