EP1953664 - Apparatus for detecting intrusion code and method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Tae Jin No. 101, Daechi Hyundai Apt., Daechi 3(sam)-dong, Gangnam-gu 135-842, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Park, Taejoon No. 2-601, Woosung Apt., 1336 Seocho-dong, Seocho-gu 137-070, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jung, Tae-Chul No. 1918, Panteon Regency, Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-957, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113628.7 | 01.08.2007 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | KR20070010300 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: KR 20070010300 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953664 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953664 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F21/22 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
G06F11/00 (KR);
G06F21/564 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ermitteln eines Eindringungscodes und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | [2008/32] | English: | Apparatus for detecting intrusion code and method using the same | [2008/32] | French: | Appareil de détection de code d'intrusion et son procédé d'utilisation | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 19.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9502293 (ALLEN LAWRENCE C III [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12,22 * page 3, line 2 - page 10, line 2 * * page 17, line 4 - page 19, line 16 * * figures 1A, 2B, 3 *[I] 8-10,19-21; | [XI]WO2005047862 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-15,17,18,21,22 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0109] * * figures 2,7,8,10,21 * [I] 5,8,9,16,19,20; | [XI]US2006037080 (MALOOF MARCUS A [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-15,17-20,22 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] * [I] 5,10,11,16,21 |