EP1886589 - A device for the treatment of filter material used in tobacco products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D S.p.A. Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states G.D. S.p.A Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Draghetti, Fiorenzo Via San Donino, 506 Fr. Villa Fontana 40059, MEDICINA (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Eusepi, Ivan Via Fratelli Kennedy, 10 40013, CASTELMAGGIORE (Bologna) / IT | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito 18 40126 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 07113753.3 | 03.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00601 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060601 | [2008/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886589 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886589 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02, B05B13/02 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
A24D3/022 (EP);
A24D3/0295 (EP);
B05B13/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von in Tabakprodukten verwendeten Filtermaterialien | [2008/07] | English: | A device for the treatment of filter material used in tobacco products | [2008/07] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement de matériau filtrant utilisé dans des produits du tabac | [2010/14] |
Former [2008/07] | Dispositif pour le traitement de matériau de filtre utilisé dans des produits du tabac | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | BE | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | LT | 14.04.2010 | LV | 14.04.2010 | MT | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | IE | 03.08.2010 | LU | 03.08.2010 | IS | 14.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
MT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
LU | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
MT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
LU | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
MT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
MT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
MT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0041482 (TABU SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,10 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1106087 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1,15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; figure - *; | [A]EP1389433 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005035141 (COS T A S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0041482 |