Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023349

EP2023349 - Device, program, and method for obtaining audio attribute data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Transtechnology, Inc.
1801, Storia-Shinagawa 2-16-8, Kunan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Hiratsuka, Koh Transtechnology, Inc.
1801, Storia-Shinagawa 2-16-8, Kounan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Sakamoto, Akira Transtechnology, Inc.
1801, Storia-Shinagawa 2-16-8, Kounan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Yoshikura, Yasuto Nagase &Co., Ltd.
5-1, Nihonbashi-Kobunacho
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8355 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Stebbing, Timothy Charles
Haseltine Lake 5th Floor Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date07113810.103.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023349
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, G11B27/32, G06F17/30
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung, Programm und Verfahren zum Erhalt von Audioattributdaten[2009/07]
English:Device, program, and method for obtaining audio attribute data[2009/07]
French:Dispositif, programme et procédé pour obtenir des données d'attribut audio[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1300849  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0122] - [0135]; figure 13 *;
 [X]US2002060955  (KUMAGAI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0152] - [0172] *;
 [X]EP1381026  (KENWOOD CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0133] , [0134] *