Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022936

EP2022936 - Solvent assisted method to mobilize viscous crude oil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Change - representativepublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Bakker, Peter
Kesslerpark 1
2288 GS Rijswijk / NL
02 / Hsu, Chia-Fu
Kesslerpark 1
2288 GS Rijswijk / NL
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Matthezing, Robert Maarten , et al
Shell International B.V.
Intellectual Property Services
P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]Matthezing, Robert Maarten , et al
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Former [2009/07]Zeestraten, Albertus W. J.
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date07113850.706.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022936
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/24
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lösungsmittelunterstütztes Verfahren zur Mobilisierung viskösen Rohöls[2009/07]
English:Solvent assisted method to mobilize viscous crude oil[2009/07]
French:Procédé de solvant assisté pour mobiliser un pétrole brut visqueux[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
21.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4513819  (ISLIP PHILIP N [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,5,9 * * the whole document *;
 [X]US4121661  (REDFORD DAVID A) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 13; claims 1,10 * * the whole document *;
 [X]US4099568  (ALLEN JOSEPH C) [X] 1-3,6,7 * claims 1,7 *;
 [X]US3908762  (REDFORD DAVID ARTHUR) [X] 1,4-7 * claims 1,3 * * the whole document *;
 [X]US4141415  (WU CHING H, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2003015321  (LIM GIT B [CA], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [E]US2007199712  (HOCKING GRANT [US]) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] *