Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023059

EP2023059 - Mounting structure for mounting of photovoltaic module and solar collectors integrated in the building [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weffling, Jean-Claude
7a, rue des Fleurs
6723 Grevenmacher / LU
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[2009/27]
Former [2009/07]Beissel, Jean , et al
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date07113928.107.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023059
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:F24J2/52, H01L31/048
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Montagegestell zur gebäudeintegrierten Anbringung von Photovoltaikmodulen und Solarkollektoren[2009/07]
English:Mounting structure for mounting of photovoltaic module and solar collectors integrated in the building[2009/07]
French:Cadre de montage destiné à l'application intégrée dans le bâtiment de modules photovoltaïques et collecteur solaire[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
22.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]BE550876  (J. VANDERMARLIERE) [X] 1,4,5,7-12 * page 2, line 34 - line 43; figure 2 *;
 [XY]US5546713  (VOEGELE JR WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-12 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 59; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,6,7;
 [Y]DE10132557  (ANTEC SOLAR GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,6,7 * paragraph [0040]; figure 5 *;
 [X]BE882860  (NOBELS YVAN L M C) [X] 1-5,9-12 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 4; figures 4,8 *;
 [X]GB1291188  (SCHNEBEL FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-12 * figure 2 *;
 [X]DE29913256U  (DACHTECHNIK HUKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9-12 * figures 10,12 *;
 [X]GB191023726  (KNOBEL HILARIUS [CH]) [X] 1,4-6,8-12 * the whole document *