Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1890193

EP1890193 - Projection objective of a microlithographic projection exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2008/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Krähmer, Daniel
Birnenweg 2
73457 Essingen / DE
02 / Ruoff, Johannes
Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 23
73447, Oberkochen / DE
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Frank, Hartmut , et al
Demski & Nobbe
Reichspräsidentenstrasse 21-25
45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/15]Frank, Hartmut , et al
Demski, Frank & Nobbe Reichspräsidentenstrasse 21-25
45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE
Former [2008/08]Frank, Hartmut
Patentanwalt Reichspräsidentenstrasse 21-25
45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE
Application number, filing date07114145.110.08.2007
[2008/08]
Priority number, dateDE2006103839815.08.2006         Original published format: DE102006038398
US20060822427P15.08.2006         Original published format: US 822427 P
[2008/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1890193
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1890193
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/08]
TitleGerman:Projektionsobjektiv einer mikrolithographischen Projektionsbelichtungsanlage[2008/08]
English:Projection objective of a microlithographic projection exposure apparatus[2008/08]
French:Objectif de projection d'une installation d'exposition par projection microlithographique[2008/08]
Examination procedure26.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
10.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2010Fee for grant paid
25.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CY27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
HU27.10.2010
IT27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
MT27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
TR27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CY27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
IT27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
MT27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
TR27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2013/26]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CY27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
IT27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
MT27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2012/05]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
IT27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
MT27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2012/03]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
IT27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2011/38]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
DK27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
PL27.10.2010
RO27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
SK27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2011/35]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
CZ27.10.2010
EE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2011/33]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
ES07.02.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2011/30]AT27.10.2010
BE27.10.2010
FI27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
SE27.10.2010
SI27.10.2010
BG27.01.2011
GR28.01.2011
IS27.02.2011
PT28.02.2011
Former [2011/23]FI27.10.2010
LT27.10.2010
LV27.10.2010
IS27.02.2011
Former [2011/20]LT27.10.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006050400  (HOFFMAN JEFFREY M [US] ET AL HOFFMAN JEFFREY M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-9,13,15-17,20,40-42 * abstract * * figure 22 * * paragraphs [0171] , [0184] * * table 4 *;
 [DX]WO02093209  (ZEISS CARL [DE]; ZEISS CARL SEMICONDUCTOR MFG [DE]; KRAEHMER DANIEL [D) [DX] 1-3,40-42 * abstract * * figure 7 * * page 39, lines 10-20 *;
 [XA]US2006109560  (KAMENOV VLADIMIR [DE] ET AL) [X] 40-42 * abstract * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0105] * [A] 1-39