Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022848

EP2022848 - A method for identifying, expanding, and removing adult stem cells and cancer stem cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2014Change - applicantpublished on 04.06.2014  [2014/23]
02.05.2014Change - representativepublished on 04.06.2014  [2014/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Nederlandse Akademie van Wetenschappen
Hubrecht Institute
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
[2014/23]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Hubrecht Institut
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 JR Utrecht / NL
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/23]
Former [2009/07]Hatzmann, Martin , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07114192.310.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022848
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/06, C12N5/08, C07K14/72, A61K38/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Identifikation, Vermehrung und Entfernung erwachsener Stammzellen und Krebsstammzellen[2009/07]
English:A method for identifying, expanding, and removing adult stem cells and cancer stem cells[2009/07]
French:Procédé d'identification, d'expansion, et de suppression de cellules souches adultes et cellules souches de cancer[2009/07]
Examination procedure11.12.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/28]
18.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/28]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1602930  (HINZMANN BERND DR [DE], et al) [X] 19-38 * claims 1-12 *;
 [X]WO2005074980  (CELLZOME AG [DE], et al) [X] 21-25,32,33 * example 2 *;
 [DX]  - MORRIS REBECCA J ET AL, "Capturing and profiling adult hair follicle stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200404), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 411 - 417, XP002457159 [DX] 1-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt950
 [DX]  - MCCLANAHAN T ET AL, "Identification of overexpression of orphan G Protein-Coupled Receptor GPR49 in human colon and ovarian primary tumors", CANCER BIOLOGY AND THERAPY 2006 UNITED STATES, (2006), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1538-4047 1555-8576, pages 419 - 426, XP002457160 [DX] 17-38 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - YAMAMOTO Y ET AL, "OVEREXPRESSION OF ORPHAN G-PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTOR, GPR49, IN HUMAN HEPATOCELLULAR CARCINOMAS WITH BETA-CATENIN MUTATIONS", HEPATOLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200303), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 528 - 533, XP008041122 [DX] 17-38 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jhep.2003.50029
 [DXA]  - VAN DER FLIER L G ET AL, "The Intestinal Wnt/TCF Signature", GASTROENTEROLOGY 2007 UNITED STATES, (200702), vol. 132, no. 2, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 628 - 632, XP002457161 [DX] 1-17 * the whole document * [A] 18-38

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2006.08.039
 [DA]  - MORITA H ET AL, "Neonatal lethality of LGR5 null mice is associated with ankyloglossia and gastrointestinal distension", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY 2004 UNITED STATES, (2004), vol. 24, no. 22, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 9736 - 9743, XP002457162 [DA] 1-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.24.22.9736-9743.2004
 [A]  - YEN TZUNG-HAI ET AL, "The gastrointestinal tract stem cell niche.", STEM CELL REVIEWS 2006, (2006), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1550-8943, pages 203 - 212, XP002457163 [A] 1-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12015-006-0048-1
 [T]  - BARKER N, VAN ES JH, KUIPERS J, KUJALA P, VAN DEN BORN M, COZIJNSEN M, HAEGEBARTH A, KORVING J, BEGTHEL H, PETERS PJ, CLEVERS H., "Identification of stem cells in small intestine and colon by marker gene Lgr5.", NATURE, (20071025), vol. 449, pages 1003 - 1008, XP002457164

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature06196