Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026449

EP2026449 - Rotor of brushless direct-current motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.12.2012  [2012/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jeung, Young-Chun
9718 Walker CT
Cypress, CA 90630 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Jeung, Young-Chun
9718 Walker CT
California Cypress CA 90630 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07114432.316.08.2007
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026449
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026449
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rotor für einen bürstenlosen Gleichstrommotor[2009/08]
English:Rotor of brushless direct-current motor[2009/08]
French:Rotor de moteur à courant continu sans balai[2009/08]
Examination procedure26.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
21.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
14.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2011Fee for grant paid
30.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2009
Opposition(s)12.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2001112203  (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [X]EP0106383  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5306123  (DAY JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 37 - line 47; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1648073  (AICHI STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0660490  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 4 - line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2151084  (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2002047431  (FUKUSHIMA TETSUHARU [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0009] *
ExaminationUS5704111