Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027831

EP2027831 - Apparatus for converting excess carbohydrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.02.2010  [2010/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fruitful Innovations BV
Hogebrinkerweg 9
3871 KM Hoevelaken / NL
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / O'Connor, Paul
Hogebrinkerweg 9
3871 KM, Hoevelaken / NL
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis , et al
Howrey LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis , et al
Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date07114592.420.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027831
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, F03G7/00, H01M8/16
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Umwandeln überschüssiger Kohlenhydrate[2009/09]
English:Apparatus for converting excess carbohydrates[2009/09]
French:Appareil de convertissement d'excès de glucides[2009/09]
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/08]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/08]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3837922  (NG D, et al) [X] 1-17 * column 6, lines 34-54 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 21 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2007059565  (SIU BILLY [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6117296  (THOMSON TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3353539  (PRESTON RICHARD J) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SEWA S ET AL, "Polymer actuator driven by ion current at low voltage, applied to catheter system", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, 1998. MEMS 98. PROCEEDINGS., THE ELEVENTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON HEIDELBERG, GERMANY 25-29 JAN. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980125), ISBN 0-7803-4412-X, pages 148 - 153, XP010270155 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.1998.659745