Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028268

EP2028268 - Generation of neuronal cells from pluripotent stem cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université Libre de Bruxelles
Avenue Franklin Roosevelt, 50
CP 161
1050 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Université Libre de Bruxelles
Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50, CP 161
1050 Brussels / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Vanderhaegen, Pierre
Vieux chemin 68
1180 Bruxelles / BE
02 / Gaspard, Nicolas
Rue de Marchienne 44
6032 Mont-sur-Marchienne / BE
03 / Naeije, Gilles
Chaussée d'Alsemberg 361
1190 Bruxelles / BE
04 / Van den Ameele, Jelle
Kraaistraat 57
9000 Gent / BE
05 / Devreker, Fabienne
Avenue Vandervelde 36
1200 Bruxelles / BE
06 / Englert, Yvon
Barakkenbergstraat 9
1540 Herne / BE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Brants, Johan P.E. , et al
De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Brants, Johan P.E. , et al
De Clercq Brants & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
Application number, filing date07114636.920.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028268
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/06
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Erzeugung von Nervenzellen aus pluripotenten Stammzellen[2009/09]
English:Generation of neuronal cells from pluripotent stem cells[2009/09]
French:Génération de cellules neuronales à partir de cellules souches pluripotentes[2009/09]
Examination procedure20.11.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
22.01.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
24.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/07]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004087870  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]  YING QI-LONG ET AL, "Conversion of embryonic stem cells into neuroectodermal precursors in adherent monoculture", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030201), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 183 - 186, XP002350599 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt780
 [A]  LAI K ET AL, "Sonic hedgehog regulates adult neural progenitor proliferation in vitro and in vivo", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US, (20030101), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 21 - 27, XP003008535 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn983
 [A]  PALMA VERONICA ET AL, "Sonic hedgehog controls stem cell behavior in the postnatal and adult brain", DEVELOPMENT (CAMBRIDGE), (200501), vol. 132, no. 2, ISSN 0950-1991, pages 335 - 344, XP002487123 [A] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.01567
 [A]  NOBUNARI SASAKIA, JUNKO KURISUA AND MINEKO KENGAKU, "The role of sonic hedgehog in dendritic spine formatio. The 30th Annual Meeting of the Japan Neuroscience Society", NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (20070720), page S88, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6T0H-4P7FHF2-29&_user=987766&_rdoc=1&_fmt=&_orig=search&_sort=d&view=c&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=1932b5457456f194b2f1f8689429a982, (20080707), XP002487124 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  GULACSI ALEXANDRA ET AL, "Sonic hedgehog and bone morphogenetic protein regulate interneuron development from dorsal telencephalic progenitors in vitro.", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20031029), vol. 23, no. 30, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 9862 - 9872, XP002487125 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicant   QIAN ET AL., NEURON, (2000), vol. 28, pages 69 - 80,
    INOUE ET AL., DEV BIOL, (2000), vol. 219, pages 373 - 383,
    WALTHER; GRUSS, DEVELOPMENT, (1991), vol. 113, pages 1435 - 1449,
    PUELLES; RUBENSTEIN, TRENDS NEUROSCI, (2003), vol. 26, pages 469 - 476,